Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Alberti

Deceased

Bishop of Cortona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1540Born
15 Jul 158544.9AppointedBishop of Cortona, Italy
4 Aug 158545.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cortona, Italy
2 Oct 159656.2DiedBishop of Cortona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Alberti
Bishop Giovanni Alberti (born , died ) Bishop of Cortona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
Ordained BishopSan Giacomo degli Spagnoli, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceCortona, Diocese of Cortona
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Cortona, Diocese of Cortona

  • a bishop for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 179
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1585, Number 17*
  • b/ob/c2: AT, 9 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 9 Oct 2018; Data: 10 Oct 2018

Quantcast