Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gian Girolamo Cardinal Albani

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1504Born
17 May 157066.3Elevated to Cardinal
20 Nov 157066.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
15 Apr 159187.2DiedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina

MicroData Summary for Gian Girolamo Albani (VIAF: 49216401)
Gian Girolamo Cardinal Albani (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBergamo, Diocese of Bergamo, Italy

  • a cardinal for 20.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 May 1570

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast