Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Macaire (Ignatius) Akkawi

Deceased

Archbishop of Bosra (Melkite Greek), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1820¹Born
21 Nov 185939.8AppointedArchbishop of Bosra (Melkite Greek), Syria
22 Nov 185939.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bosra (Melkite Greek), Syria
7 Aug 187050.5DiedArchbishop of Bosra (Melkite Greek), Syria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Macaire (Ignatius) Akkawi
Archbishop Macaire (Ignatius) Akkawi (born 1820, died ) Archbishop of Bosra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDer el Kamar

  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1859, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Feb 2017