Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel de la Calle y Heredia

Deceased

Bishop of Valladolid


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1610¹BornGranada
1634²24.0Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jul 167161.5AppointedBishop of Valladolid, Spain
18 Oct 167161.7Ordained BishopBishop of Valladolid, Spain
4 Jan 167969.0DiedBishop of Valladolid, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabriel de la Calle y Heredia
Bishop Gabriel de la Calle y Heredia (born 1610, died ) Bishop of Valladolid

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 7.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 403
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 207, Number 1,296
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 67
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,781

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 11 Feb 2016