Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Stefano Cardinal Agostini

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1614²Born
3 Dec 166955.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa
14 Jun 167157.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa
1 Sep 168167.6Elevated to Cardinal
22 Sep 168167.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
21 Mar 168369.2DiedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stefano Agostini (VIAF: 89110399)
Stefano Cardinal Agostini (born 1614, died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceForlì, Italy

  • a bishop for 11.7 years
  • a cardinal for 1.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Sep 1681
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 201
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast