Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Congregation of the Sons of Mary Immaculate
Pavonians

(Institute of Consecrated Life)

Congregatio Filiorum Marię Immaculatę



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Institute of Consecrated Life
  • Decretum Laudis: 31 March 1843
  • Clerical Religious Congregation
  • Mailing Address: Via di Villa Zingone, 21, 00151 Roma, Italia
  • Telephone: 06.534.96.30; 06.68.68.820
  • Fax: 06.68.33.050

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
31 March 1843Decretum LaudisCongregation of the Sons of Mary Immaculate
8 December 1847FoundedCongregation of the Sons of Mary Immaculate
24 September 1892ApprobationCongregation of the Sons of Mary Immaculate

Statistics

YearReligious PriestsMale ReligiousParishesSource
1954250ap1955
1963300ap1964
196710328320ap1968
197411627429ap1975
197711427530ap1978
199512222929ap1996
201210420233ap2013
201310819735ap2014
201410619436ap2015

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_d, v3.0.9, 4 May 2015; Data: 20 May 2015