Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Missionaries of Workers

(Institute of Consecrated Life)

Institutum Missionariorum Opificum



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Institute of Consecrated Life
  • Founded: 21 November 1894
  • Clerical Religious Congregation
  • Mailing Address: 67, rue Jules Destree, B-6000 Charleroi, Belgio
  • Telephone: (071)41.77.78
  • Fax: 48.69.32

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
21 November 1894FoundedMissionaries of Workers
10 June 1930Decretum LaudisMissionaries of Workers
4 June 1935ApprobationMissionaries of Workers

Statistics

YearReligious PriestsMale ReligiousParishesSource
2013376712ap2014
2014366210ap2015

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_d, v3.1.6, 5 May 2016; Data: 21 Aug 2016