Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Moosonee

Dioecesis Musonitanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Vincent Cadieux, O.M.I., Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 13 July 1967
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Keewatin-Le Pas
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Province: Ontario
  • Country: Canada
  • Square Kilometers: 1,200,000 (463,500 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Ontario
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: Moo
  • Mailing Address: C.P. 40, Moosonee, Ont., P0L 1Y0, Canada
  • Telephone: (705)336-2908
  • Fax: 336-2759

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Baie de James {James Bay}
3 December 1938ErectedDiocese of Haileybury
Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Ontario (Ontario-Nord)
Vicariate Apostolic of Baie de James {James Bay} (erected)
Diocese of Moosonee
13 July 1967ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Baie de James {James Bay} Diocese of Moosonee (Name Changed and Vicariate raised to a Diocese)
31 May 2007Territory LostDiocese of Moosonee Diocese of Amos (Chisasibi, Radisson, Waskaganish)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Baie de James {James Bay}
19491,5706,20025.3%1919824524ap1951
19662,78212,45622.3%2121132281414ap1967
Diocese of Moosonee
19682,58213,06519.8%18181434134ap1971
19763,50020,00017.5%21315233362615ap1977
19804,00020,20019.8%313162501312015ap1981
19904,10020,40020.1%210123411141115ap1991
19995,33019,99026.7%15688818918ap2000
20005,45519,99827.3%1569098917ap2001
20015,36720,15526.6%1451,0737618ap2002
20025,71021,12127.0%1341,42716420ap2003
20036,00022,10027.1%1341,50096420ap2004
20046,10022,20027.5%1341,52515418ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.0, 29 Jul 2012; data: 3 Sep 2012