Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Prefecture Apostolic of Marianne Islands

United

To: Vicariate Apostolic of Marianne and Caroline Islands



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
17 September 1902ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Marianne Islands (erected)
1 October 1906ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Marianne Islands (erected)
1 March 1911UnitedPrefecture Apostolic of Caroline Islands
Prefecture Apostolic of Marianne Islands
Vicariate Apostolic of Marianne and Caroline Islands

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 3 Dec 2011