Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Doruma-Dungu

Dioecesis Dorumaensis-Dunguensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Richard Domba Mady, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 3 July 1970
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Kisangani
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Congo, The Democratic Republic of
  • Square Kilometers: 44,000 (16,995 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, B.P. 20, Dungu [par Isiro], Haut-Congo Rep. Democratique du Congo

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Doruma
24 February 1958ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Niangara Prefecture Apostolic of Doruma (erected)
Diocese of Doruma
26 September 1967ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Doruma Diocese of Doruma
Diocese of Doruma-Dungu
3 July 1970Name ChangedDiocese of Doruma Diocese of Doruma-Dungu

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Doruma
196955,000260,00021.2%426301,83334231ap1971
Diocese of Doruma-Dungu
198084,000340,00024.7%429332,545934522ap1981
1990226,241371,40060.9%925346,654655917ap1991
1995105,000200,00052.5%1615313,387623510ap2003
2003105,000200,00052.5%2416402,625372911ap2004
2004105,000200,00052.5%2416402,625372911ap2005
2006362,743492,00073.7%2415399,301533311ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 3 Dec 2011