Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Juan Cardinal Z˙˝iga y Pimentel

Deceased

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1465²Born
5 May 150338.3AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
29 Nov 150338.9Elevated to Cardinal
6 Dec 150338.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
26 Jul 150439.5DiedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Z˙˝iga y Pimentel (VIAF: 187378277)
Juan Cardinal Z˙˝iga y Pimentel (born 1465, died ) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBÚjar, Diocese of Plasencia

  • a cardinal for .6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 Nov 1503
  • b: Episcopologio Espa˝ol, Volume 1500, Page 20, Number 28
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1503, Number 14*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 165
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 211

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast