Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastiano Zucchetti

Deceased

Bishop of Cortona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1643³BornPisa
5 Mar 166723.6Ordained PriestPriest
27 Apr 170561.7AppointedBishop of Cortona, Italy
Sep 1714³71.1DiedBishop of Cortona, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sebastiano Zucchetti:
Bishop Sebastiano Zucchetti (born , died Sep 1714) Bishop of Cortona

  • a priest for 47.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 174
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1705, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 17 Jun 2015