Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de Zuazola

Deceased

Bishop of Astorga, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Apr 1589AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
4 Jun 1589Ordained BishopBishop of Astorga, Spain
2 Sep 1589InstalledBishop of Astorga, Spain
1 Nov 1590DiedBishop of Astorga, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan de Zuazola
Bishop Juan de Zuazola (died ) Bishop of Astorga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlcántara, Diocese of Coria
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Magdalena, Convent, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo
Death PlaceSanta Martha de Riva de Texa

  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 122
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,826
  • bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 102, Number 643
  • ob/c2+: CB, 7 Sep 2016
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 18,963
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1589, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast