Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop William Zouch

Deceased

Archbishop of York, England


Events

DateEventTitle
2 May 1340SelectedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
7 Jul 1342Ordained BishopArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
19 Jul 1352DiedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Zouch:
Archbishop William Zouch (died ) Archbishop of York

  • a bishop for 10.0 years
  • Principal Consecrator:
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 233
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 75
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 106

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013