Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andreas Zmajević

Deceased

Archbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1625¹Born
23 Dec 167045.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Budua (Budva), Montenegro
23 Feb 167146.1AppointedArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro
9 Aug 167146.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro
7 Sep 169469.6DiedArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andreas Zmajević
Archbishop Andreas Zmajević (born 1625, died ) Archbishop of Bar (Antivari)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePerasto

  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 88, and Page 129
  • ob/c2: CB, 14 May 2013
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast