Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Carlo Zappa, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Prefect of Upper Niger {Niger Superiore}, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1861Born
21 May 188018.4ProfessedMember of Society of African Missions
18 May 188422.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Society of African Missions
8 Jun 188422.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
6 May 189634.3AppointedPrefect of Upper Niger {Niger Superiore}, Nigeria
30 Jan 191755.1DiedPrefect of Upper Niger {Niger Superiore}, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Carlo Zappa
Father Carlo Zappa S.M.A. (born , died ) Prefect of Upper Niger {Niger Superiore}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Ordained BishopAsaba

  • a priest for 32.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Apostolische Nachfolge
  • b: CB, 19 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Jun 2017