Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Ignace Michel Zahir (Daher)

Deceased

Patriarch Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1761Born
3 Jul 178827.1Ordained PriestPriest
4 May 180241.0SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
4 May 180241.0SelectedBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Syrian), Lebanon
16 May 180241.0Ordained BishopPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
20 Dec 180241.6ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
20 Dec 180241.6ConfirmedBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Syrian), Lebanon
Sep 1810³49.3ResignedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
Sep 1810³49.3ResignedBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Syrian), Lebanon
22 Jan 182260.7DiedPatriarch Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignace Michel Zahir (Daher)
Patriarch Ignace Michel Zahir (Daher) (born , died ) Patriarch Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlep

  • a priest for 33.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 20
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 80
  • b: CB, 15 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017