Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jack Youssef, C.M.

Apostolic Administrator of Ispahan, Iran


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1971 Born
11 Sep 200230.8ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
1 Jul 200533.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
20 Jan 201543.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ispahan, Iran

MicroData Summary for Jack Youssef
Father Jack Youssef C.M. (born ) Apostolic Administrator of Ispahan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTeheran

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Ispahan.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Jan 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast