Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tideman de Winchcomb

Deceased

Bishop of Worcester, England


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Apr 1394AppointedBishop of Llandaff, Wales, Great Britain
15 Jun 1395AppointedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
10 Jun 1401DiedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Tideman de Winchcomb:
Bishop Tideman de Winchcomb (died ) Bishop of Worcester

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 59
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 529, and Page 292
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 247
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 82

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013