Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Alexander Dunbar Winchester (Winster)

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Scotland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1625BornGarmouth
21 May 165631.4Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jun 166237.4AppointedPrefect of Scotland, Great Britain
166843.0ResignedPrefect of Scotland, Great Britain
167247.0AppointedPrefect of Scotland, Great Britain
Jul 169368.5ResignedPrefect of Scotland, Great Britain
14 Jan 170883.0DiedPrefect Emeritus of Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Alexander Dunbar Winchester (Winster):
Priest Alexander Dunbar Winchester (Winster) (died ) Prefect Emeritus of Scotland

  • a priest for 51.6 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013