Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wacław Wierzbicki

Deceased

Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Apr 1534AppointedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
3 May 1534Ordained BishopBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
18 Jul 1555DiedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Wacław Wierzbicki
Bishop Wacław Wierzbicki (died ) Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRiga, Archdiocese of Riga, Latvia

  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,776
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 239
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,028
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,212
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1534, Number 9
  • fn: JI, 1 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 3 Apr 2019

Quantcast