Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Friedrich zu Wied

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Münster, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1478Born
6 Nov 152244.8SelectedBishop of Münster, Germany
30 Jan 152345.0ConfirmedBishop of Münster, Germany
12 Dec 153153.9ResignedBishop-Elect of Münster, Germany
1551²73.0DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Münster, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Friedrich zu Wied
Father Friedrich zu Wied (born 1478, died 1551) Former Bishop-Elect of Münster

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 247

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast