Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father August Wiederin von Ottersbach

Deceased

Prefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1575Born
159924.0Ordained PriestPriest
25 Feb 160934.1SelectedPrefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany
4 May 160934.3ConfirmedPrefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany
27 Jun 162045.4DiedPrefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany

MicroData Summary for August Wiederin von Ottersbach
Father August Wiederin von Ottersbach (born 1575, died ) Prefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}

EventPlace
Birth PlacePrague

  • a priest for 21.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast