Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roger Weseham

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Coventry and Lichfield, England


Events

DateEventTitle
1245¹AppointedBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain
19 Feb 1245³Ordained BishopBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain
4 Dec 1256ResignedBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain
20 May 1257DiedBishop Emeritus of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Roger Weseham:
Bishop Roger Weseham (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Coventry and Lichfield

  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 59
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 548

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013