Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul de Wath

Deceased

Bishop of Samland (Sambia), Poland


Events

DateEventTitle
31 Jul 1503SelectedBishop of Samland (Sambia), Poland
11 Dec 1503ConfirmedBishop of Samland (Sambia), Poland
1 Sep 1505DiedBishop of Samland (Sambia), Poland

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Paul de Wath
Bishop Paul de Wath (died ) Bishop of Samland (Sambia)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 229
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 291
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,503, Number 41*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast