Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Walton, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Dublin, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
4 May 1472AppointedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
27 Aug 1472³Ordained BishopArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
14 Jun 1484ResignedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Walton
Archbishop John Walton C.R.S.A. , Archbishop Emeritus of Dublin

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 146
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,472, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast