Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Joseph Oswald Timothée Waller, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Eastern Nigeria {Nigeria Orientale}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1866BornBennwihr, France
10 Jul 189226.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
191245.9AppointedPrefect of Eastern Nigeria {Nigeria Orientale}
192962.9ResignedPrefect of Eastern Nigeria {Nigeria Orientale}
6 Jul 193973.4DiedPrefect Emeritus of Eastern Nigeria {Nigeria Orientale}

MicroData Summary for Joseph Oswald Timothée Waller
Father Joseph Oswald Timothée Waller S.M.A. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Eastern Nigeria {Nigeria Orientale}

  • a priest for 46.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Apostolische Nachfolge

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 4 May 2016