Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Waleram

Deceased

Bishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Nov 1182AppointedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
19 Dec 1182Ordained BishopBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
29 Aug 1184DiedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Waleram
Bishop Waleram (died ) Bishop of Rochester

EventPlace
Ordained BishopLisieux, Diocese of Lisieux, France

  • a bishop for 1.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 50
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 559
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 92, Number 7,752

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast