Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bruno von Waldeck

Deceased

Bishop of Minden, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
5 May 1037AppointedBishop of Minden, Germany
29 May 1037Ordained BishopBishop of Minden, Germany
10 Feb 1055DiedBishop of Minden, Germany

MicroData Summary for Bruno von Waldeck
Bishop Bruno von Waldeck (died ) Bishop of Minden

EventPlace
Ordained BishopMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy

  • a bishop for 17.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 3 Feb 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast