Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leo von Spaur

Deceased

Bishop of Wien, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1440²Born
1467²27.0Ordained PriestPriest
9 Aug 146929.6AppointedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
Sep 1469³29.6Ordained BishopBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
23 Dec 147131.9ConfirmedBishop of Wien, Austria
6 Mar 147939.1DiedBishop of Wien, Austria

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Leo von Spaur
Bishop Leo von Spaur (born 1440, died ) Bishop of Wien

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBurgstall

  • a priest for 12.1 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,900
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 268, and Page 111

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast