Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ernst von Schaumberg

Deceased

Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
1458SelectedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
24 Mar 1458ConfirmedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
29 Aug 1459Ordained PriestPriest
8 Dec 1459Ordained BishopBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
22 Jul 1471DiedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany

MicroData Summary for Ernst von Schaumberg
Bishop Ernst von Schaumberg (died ) Bishop of Hildesheim

  • a priest for 11.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,612
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1459, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast