Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Volanti

Deceased

Bishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1660Born
18 Dec 168323.0Ordained PriestPriest
7 May 171049.4AppointedBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia
8 Apr 174180.3DiedBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Francesco Volanti
Bishop Francesco Volanti (born , died ) Bishop of Stagno (Ston)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRagusa

  • a priest for 57.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 363
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1710, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast