Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedikt Vinković

Deceased

Bishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1581²Born
16 Apr 160928.2Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jun 163352.4AppointedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
19 Mar 1634³53.2Ordained BishopBishop of Pécs, Hungary
163756.0SelectedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
28 Apr 164261.3ConfirmedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
2 Dec 164261.9DiedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Benedikt Vinković
Bishop Benedikt Vinković (born 1581, died ) Bishop of Zagreb (Agram)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJastrebarsko, Diocese of Zagreb (Agram)
Death PlaceZagreb, Diocese of Zagreb (Agram)

  • a priest for 33.6 years
  • a bishop for 8.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 290, and Page 376
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 379, and Page 382
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,633, Number 45
  • b/ob/d: CB, 15 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast