Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Villafañe

Deceased

Bishop of Osma, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1571¹Born
12 May 163160.3AppointedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
8 Feb 163261.1Ordained BishopBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
5 Sep 163362.6AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
26 Aug 163564.6DiedBishop of Osma, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Villafañe
Bishop Francisco Villafañe (born 1571, died ) Bishop of Osma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeón

  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 243, and Page 268
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 155, Number 984
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1632, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast