Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean de Vienne

Deceased

Archbishop of Reims, France


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Apr 1328AppointedBishop of Avranches, France
14 Dec 1330AppointedBishop of Thérouanne, France
12 Oct 1334AppointedArchbishop of Reims, France
14 Jun 1351DiedArchbishop of Reims, France

MicroData Summary for Jean de Vienne
Archbishop Jean de Vienne (died ) Archbishop of Reims

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 419, and Page 351
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 21 Jun 2020

Quantcast