Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Cristoforo Cardinal Vidman

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Marco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1617BornVenice, Italy
7 Oct 164730.8Elevated to Cardinal
16 Dec 164731.0InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
1 Apr 165841.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
30 Sep 166043.7DiedCardinal-Priest of San Marco

MicroData Summary for Cristoforo Vidman:
Cardinal Cristoforo Vidman (died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Marco

  • a cardinal for 13.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 Oct 1647

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013