Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann von Heideck

Deceased

Bishop of Eichstätt


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Oct 1415SelectedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
29 Oct 1415ConfirmedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
Nov 1415²Ordained BishopBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
3 Jun 1429DiedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann von Heideck:
Bishop Johann von Heideck (died ) Bishop of Eichstätt

  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 243
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,816

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013