Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Maura Verzich, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Order of Saint Benedict


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1911Born
15 Aug 193321.6ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
18 Sep 193826.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
8 Jun 194634.4AppointedAbbot of Order of Saint Benedict
1969²57.0ResignedAbbot of Order of Saint Benedict
27 Aug 199280.6DiedAbbot Emeritus of Order of Saint Benedict

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Maura Verzich
Abbot Maura Verzich O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Order of Saint Benedict

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKostomlátkách

  • a priest for 53.9 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast