Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Julius von Braunschweig-Lüneburg

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Minden


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1528BornWolfenbüttel
23 Apr 155324.8AppointedBishop of Minden, Germany
Feb 155425.5ResignedBishop-Elect of Minden, Germany
13 May 158960.8DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Minden, Germany

MicroData Summary for Julius von Braunschweig-Lüneburg:
Father Julius von Braunschweig-Lüneburg (born , died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Minden

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015