Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Christoph von Braunschweig-Lüneburg

Deceased

Archbishop of Bremen (and Hamberg), Germany

Bishop of Verden


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1487¹Born
7 May 150114.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Bremen (and Hamberg), Germany
7 Jun 150316.4AppointedBishop of Verden, Germany
4 Dec 151124.9SucceededArchbishop of Bremen (and Hamberg), Germany
18 Jul 151831.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bremen (and Hamberg), Germany
22 Jan 155871.0DiedArchbishop of Bremen (and Hamberg), Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Christoph von Braunschweig-Lüneburg (VIAF: 81178314)
Archbishop Christoph von Braunschweig-Lüneburg (born 1487, died ) Archbishop of Bremen (and Hamberg)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWolfenbüttel
Ordained BishopAugsburg, Diocese of Augsburg

  • a bishop for 39.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1518, Number 17
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 331, and Page 139
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 110, and Page 265

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 31 May 2018

Quantcast