Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marquard von Berg

Deceased

Bishop of Augsburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1528¹Born
26 Jul 157547.5SelectedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
23 Sep 157547.7ConfirmedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
8 Dec 157547.9Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jan 157648.0Ordained BishopBishop of Augsburg, Germany
28 Jan 159163.0DiedBishop of Augsburg, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marquard von Berg (VIAF: 231036077)
Bishop Marquard von Berg (born 1528, died ) Bishop of Augsburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOepfingen
Ordained BishopDilingen

  • a priest for 15.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1576, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 123

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast