Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Friedrich von Aufseß (Aufsess)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bamberg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1370Born
3 Jun 142151.4SelectedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
21 Sep 142151.7ConfirmedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
7 Jan 142252.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bamberg, Germany
19 Nov 143161.9ResignedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
26 Feb 144070.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Friedrich von Aufseß (Aufsess):
Bishop Friedrich von Aufseß (Aufsess) (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bamberg

  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 127
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,832

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013