Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Uva, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Lanciano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1646BornMelphiten
18 Apr 170154.9AppointedArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
Jan 171770.6DiedArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Uva:
Archbishop Giovanni Uva O.F.M. (born ) Archbishop of Lanciano

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 235

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013