Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Antonio Umeres de Miranda (Humeres)

Deceased

Bishop of Panamá


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jan 1715BornSantiago, Chile
Nov 174530.8Ordained PriestPriest of Concepción, Chile
15 Dec 177762.9AppointedBishop of Panamá
177863.0Ordained BishopBishop of Panamá
11 Sep 179176.6DiedBishop of Panamá

MicroData Summary for José Antonio Umeres de Miranda (Humeres):
Bishop José Antonio Umeres de Miranda (Humeres) (died ) Bishop of Panamá

  • a priest for 45.8 years
  • a bishop for 13.6 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015