Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Andrés de Achurra y Núñez del Arco

Deceased

Bishop of Trujillo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1736BornPanama
15 Dec 178852.8AppointedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
10 May 178953.2Ordained BishopBishop of Trujillo, Peru
1792¹55.9DiedBishop of Trujillo, Peru

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Andrés de Achurra y Núñez del Arco
Bishop José Andrés de Achurra y Núñez del Arco (born , died 1792) Bishop of Trujillo

  • a bishop for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 419
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1789, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016