Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Cardinal Ugolini

Deceased

Priest of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1783BornMacerata, Italy
12 Feb 183855.1Elevated to Cardinal
12 Feb 183855.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
13 Sep 183855.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
17 Dec 185572.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
15 Mar 185875.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
19 Dec 186785.0DiedPriest of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Ugolini:
Cardinal Giuseppe Ugolini (born , died ) Priest of Roman Curia - Other

  • a cardinal for 29.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 54, and Page 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013