Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Johann Joseph Cardinal von Trautson zu Falkenstein (Trauston)

Deceased

Archbishop of Wien {Vienna}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1704BornWien
26 Sep 172824.2Ordained PriestPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
7 Dec 175046.4AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
7 Dec 175046.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cartagine
25 Dec 175046.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Cartagine
12 Apr 175146.7SucceededArchbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
29 Jun 175146.9InstalledArchbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
5 Apr 175651.7Elevated to Cardinal
10 Mar 175752.6DiedArchbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

MicroData Summary for Johann Joseph von Trautson zu Falkenstein (Trauston):
Cardinal Johann Joseph von Trautson zu Falkenstein (Trauston) (born , died ) Archbishop of Wien {Vienna}

  • a priest for 28.5 years
  • a bishop for 6.2 years
  • a cardinal for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013