Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Gebhard Truchseß von Waldburg

Deceased

Former Archbishop-Elect of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Titular See: (left the Church)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1547Born
5 Dec 157730.0SelectedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
19 Mar 157830.3Ordained PriestPriest
29 Feb 158032.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
1 Apr 158335.3ResignedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
31 May 160153.5DiedFormer Archbishop-Elect of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Gebhard Truchseß von Waldburg (VIAF: 10639061)
Father Gebhard Truchseß von Waldburg (born , died ) Former Archbishop-Elect of Köln {Cologne}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHeiligenberg

  • a priest for 23.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1580
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 172

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast