Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Carlo Giovanni Turcotti, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Kweichow [Guizhou], China

Titular Bishop of Andravida

Titular See: (never consecrated)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1643Born
15 Mar 166016.4EnteredMember of Society of Jesus
20 Oct 169653.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kweichow [Guizhou], China
20 Oct 169653.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Andravida
15 Oct 170663.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Kweichow [Guizhou], China

MicroData Summary for Carlo Giovanni Turcotti
Father Carlo Giovanni Turcotti S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Kweichow [Guizhou]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Death PlaceFatshan near Canton

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 84
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,697, Number 49
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast