Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Tulles

Deceased

Bishop of Orange, France


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Aug 1605AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Orange, France
17 Aug 1605AppointedTitular Bishop of Troas
28 Aug 1605Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Troas
5 Aug 1608SucceededBishop of Orange, France
3 Oct 1640DiedBishop of Orange, France

MicroData Summary for Jean de Tulles
Bishop Jean de Tulles (died ) Bishop of Orange

  • a bishop for 35.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 102, and Page 346
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,878
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,605, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast